EP0639191 - INDAZOL-3-ONE-2-YL DERIVATIVES OF BENZOPYRANS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Home Products Corporation Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states AMERICAN HOME PRODUCTS CORPORATION Five Giralda Farms Madison, New Jersey 07940-0874 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTERA, John, Anthony 22 Pelham Road Kendall Park, NJ 08824 / US | 02 /
ANTANE, Schuyler, Adam 32-12 Fox Run Drive Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Connelly, Michael John, et al C/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/47] | Connelly, Michael John, et al c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | ||
Former [1995/08] | Connelly, Michael John c/o Patent Department Wyeth Laboratories Huntercombe Lane South Taplow Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93911065.6 | 05.05.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993US04230 | Priority number, date | US19920880450 | 08.05.1992 Original published format: US 880450 | US19920951525 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: US 951525 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323393 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639191 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0639191 | Date: | 20.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/04, A61K31/415 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
C07D405/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/415 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | INDAZOL-3-ONE-2-YL-BENZOPYRAN-DERIVATE | [1995/08] | English: | INDAZOL-3-ONE-2-YL DERIVATIVES OF BENZOPYRANS | [1995/08] | French: | DERIVES D'INDAZOL-3-ONE-2-YL DE BENZOPYRANNES | [1995/08] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 11.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0158923 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [X]EP0284174 (ICI PLC [GB], et al); | [XP]US5179118 (BUTERA JOHN A [US], et al) | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 33, no. 6, June 1990, WASHINGTON US pages 1529 - 1541 DAVID W ROBERTSON ET AL 'Potassium channel modulators:Scientific applications and therapeutic promise' cited in the application |