EP0640105 - ADHESIVE AGENT CONTAINING POLYSILOXANE-GRAFTED POLYMER, AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.05.1998 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.1998 | Refusal of application | published on 15.07.1998 [1998/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORGERSON, Peter, Marte 4127 U.S. Rt. 35 NW Washington Ct. House, OH 43160 / US | 02 /
BALCHUNAS, Anthony, Thomas 5468 Yosemite Drive Fairfield, OH 45014 / US | [1995/09] | Representative(s) | Brooks, Maxim Courtney Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/09] | Brooks, Maxim Courtney Procter & Gamble Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93911225.6 | 11.05.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993US04429 | Priority number, date | US19920883974 | 15.05.1992 Original published format: US 883974 | [1995/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9323446 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640105 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08F299/08, A61K7/06 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
A61K8/895 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
A61Q5/06 (EP);
C08F290/148 (EP);
C09J155/005 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C09J4/06, C08F290/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/09] | Title | German: | POLYSILOXENE-PFROPFPOLYMERSIERTE ENTHALTENDE HAFTVERMITTLER UND KOSMETISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [1995/09] | English: | ADHESIVE AGENT CONTAINING POLYSILOXANE-GRAFTED POLYMER, AND COSMETIC COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [1995/09] | French: | AGENTS ADHESIFS CONTENANT UN POLYMERE A GREFFE POLYSILOXANE ET LEUR COMPOSITIONS COSMETIQUES | [1995/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1998/29] | 22.01.1998 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1998/29] | Request for further processing for: | 16.09.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4972037 (GARBE JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,8-10 ** column 3, line 39 - line 48 *; | [DA]EP0408311 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1 * claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP0412704 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,11,12 * claims 1-11 * * page 4, line 2 - line 12 * * page 5, line 41 - page 6, line 37 * * page 7, line 15 - line 55 * |