EP0639155 - PRODUCT RATIO IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM FOR BEVERAGE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company P.O.Drawer 1734 Atlanta, GA 30301 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY P.O.Drawer 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROEDER, Alfred, A. 2811 Whisper Fawn San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | 02 /
ROMANYSZYN, Michael, T., Jr. 3539 Oakhorne San Antonio, TX 78265 / US | 03 /
BRUMLEY, Jack, F. 8118 Bideford Lane Houston, TX 77070 / US | 04 /
WITTIG, Norman, P. 139 W. Bond Street Corry, PA 16407 / US | [1995/08] | Representative(s) | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/08] | Hague, Alison Jane, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93911269.4 | 13.05.1993 | [1995/08] | WO1993US04495 | Priority number, date | US19920883332 | 14.05.1992 Original published format: US 883332 | [1995/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323327 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0639155 | Date: | 22.02.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00 | [1995/08] | CPC: |
B67D1/0895 (EP,US);
B67D1/00 (KR);
B67D1/0032 (EP,US);
B67D1/0044 (EP,US);
B67D1/0048 (EP,US);
B67D1/005 (EP,US);
B67D1/0079 (EP,US);
B67D1/10 (EP,US);
B67D1/108 (EP,US);
F04C2/1071 (EP,US);
G01F11/021 (EP,US);
B67D2001/0811 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/08] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG DES PRODUKTVERHÄLTNISSES FÜR EINEN GETRÄNKESPENDER | [1995/08] | English: | PRODUCT RATIO IDENTIFICATION SYSTEM FOR BEVERAGE DISPENSER | [1995/08] | French: | SYSTEME D'IDENTIFICATION DE DOSAGE D'UN PRODUIT POUR DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSONS | [1995/08] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/08] | 23.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/17] | 01.12.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3851127 (GARDNER J, et al); | [A]EP0306265 (JET SPRAY CORP [US]); | [A]US4955507 (KIRSCHNER JONATHAN [US], et al); | [A]EP0418927 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al); | [A]EP0455431 (STEINER CO INC [US]) |