EP0640025 - FOIL HOLDER FOR AN ELECTRIC RAZOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1995/09] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurter Strasse 145 D-61476 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WETZEL, Matthias Zeisselstrasse 23 D-60318 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1995/09] | Application number, filing date | 93911499.7 | 23.04.1993 | [1995/09] | WO1993EP00987 | Priority number, date | DE19924215398 | 11.05.1992 Original published format: DE 4215398 | [1995/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9323213 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0640025 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0640025 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/04, B26B19/38 | [1995/09] | CPC: |
B26B19/384 (EP,US);
B26B19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/09] | Title | German: | SCHERFOLIENHALTERUNG FÜR EINEN TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT | [1995/09] | English: | FOIL HOLDER FOR AN ELECTRIC RAZOR | [1995/09] | French: | SUPPORT DE GRILLE POUR RASOIR ELECTRIQUE | [1995/09] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/09] | 09.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2360679 (HOLSCLAW NEIL A); | [A]US3440725 (MESSINGER WERNER, et al); | [A]DE1801545 (APAG APPBAU AG GOLDACH); | [A]DE2019746 (BRAUN AG) |