EP0633892 - N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3,5-DIENE-17-beta-CARBOXAMIDE-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID POLYMORPH A [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/03] | N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3,5-DIENE-17$g(b)-CARBOXAMIDE-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID POLYMORPH A | ||
[1998/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/21] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION P.O. Box 7929 1 Franklin Plaza Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAINE, Neil, Howard 216 Edgehill Road Merion, PA 19066 / US | 02 /
HOLDER, Neville, Lewis 13 Clemson Road Cherry Hill, NJ 08034 / US | 03 /
KLINE, Donald, Nathaniel 912 Mill Grove Drive Audubon, PA 19403 / US | 04 /
WEBB, Robert, Lee 512 N. Veronica Road West Chester, PA 19380 / US | 05 /
ZUBER, Gary, Edward 35 Skyline Drive Audubon, PA 19403 / US | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Giddings, Peter John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Giddings, Peter John, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 93911567.1 | 24.03.1993 | [1995/03] | WO1993US02974 | Priority number, date | GB19920006413 | 24.03.1992 Original published format: GB 9206413 | [1995/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9319081 | Date: | 30.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633892 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633892 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.09.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07J41/00, C07J75/00 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
C07J41/0066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/03] | Title | German: | N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3, 5-DIEN-17-beta-CARBOXAMID-3-CARBONSÄURE POLYMORPHA | [1998/33] | English: | N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3,5-DIENE-17-beta-CARBOXAMIDE-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID POLYMORPH A | [1998/33] | French: | POLYMORPHE A D'ACIDE N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3,5-DIENE-17-beta-CARBOXAMIDE-3-CARBOXYLIQUE | [1998/33] |
Former [1995/03] | N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3, 5-DIEN-17-g(b)-CARBOXAMID-3-CARBONSÄURE POLYMORPHA | ||
Former [1995/03] | N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3,5-DIENE-17$g(b)-CARBOXAMIDE-3-CARBOXYLIC ACID POLYMORPH A | ||
Former [1995/03] | POLYMORPHE A D'ACIDE N-T-BUTYL-ANDROST-3,5-DIENE-17$g(b)-CARBOXAMIDE-3-CARBOXYLIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.1994 | Search fee paid | 27.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 27.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 23.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0289327 (SMITHKLINE BECKMAN CORP [US]) [XD] 1,4,8* the whole document * | International search | [YP] - Endocrinology, 1992, LAMB et al., "Prostatic Involution in Rats Induced by a Novel 5 - Reductase Inhibitor, SK&F 105657: Role for Testosterone in the Androgenic Response", pp. 685-694, see 686. | [YP] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, 1992, HARRIS et al., "Identification and Selective Inhibition of an Isozyme of Steroid 5 - Reductase in Human Scalp", pp. 10787-10791, see p. 10789. | [Y] - Bioorganic Chemistry, 1989, METCALF et al., "Potent Inhibition of Human Steroid 5 - Reductase by 3-Androstene -3- Carboxylic Acids", pp. 372-376, see p. 374. | [Y] - Journal of Steroid Biochemistry, 1989, LEVY et al., "Interaction Between Rat Prostatic Steroid 5 - Reductase and 3-Carboxy-17B-Substituted Steroids: Novel Mechanism of Enzyme Inhibition", pp. 571-575, see 572-3. | [Y] - Biochemistry, 1990, LEVY et al., "Inhibition of Rat Liver Steroid 5 - Reductase by 3-Androstene-3- Carboxylic Acids: Mechanism of Enzyme Inhibitor Interaction", pp. 2815-2823, see p. 2817. | [Y] - Bioorganic Chemistry, 1991, LEVY et al., "3-Phosphinic Acid and 3-Phosphonic Acid Steroids as Inhibitors of Steroid 5 - Reductase: Species Comparison and Mechanistic Studies", pp. 245-260, see pp. 246, 254. | [Y] - Journal of Medicinal Chemistry, 1990, HOLT et al., "Inhibition of Steroid 5 - Reductase by Unsaturated 3-Carboxy Steroids", pp. 943-950, see p. 945. |