EP0596084 - FOODSTUFF COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MULTIFORSA AG Hinterbergstrasse 58 CH-6312 Steinhausen / CH | [1994/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Charles Langensandstrasse CH-6005 Luzern / CH | 02 /
KAESER, Beat Küntwilerstrasse 73 CH-6343 Rotkreuz / US | [1994/19] | Representative(s) | Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 6940 8002 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | Hug Interlizenz AG Nordstrasse 31 CH-8035 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 93911719.8 | 13.05.1993 | [1994/19] | WO1993CH00120 | Priority number, date | CH19920001680 | 25.05.1992 Original published format: CH 168092 | US19930013044 | 04.02.1993 Original published format: US 13044 | [1994/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324024 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0596084 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23P1/08, A23G9/02, A23C9/13, A23C19/076, A23G9/28, B65D77/08 | [1994/19] | CPC: |
A23G9/42 (EP,US);
A23C19/0765 (EP,US);
A23C9/1315 (EP,US);
A23G7/00 (EP,US);
A23G9/286 (EP,US);
A23G9/48 (EP,US);
A23G9/503 (EP,US);
A23P20/20 (EP,US);
B65D77/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1994/19] | Title | German: | LEBENSMITTEL-KOMBINATION | [1994/19] | English: | FOODSTUFF COMBINATION | [1994/19] | French: | COMBINAISON DE DENREES ALIMENTAIRES | [1994/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1993 | National basic fee paid | 17.12.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.12.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/19] | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/10] | 06.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2279203 (ALBERT MUSHER); | [Y]EP0002037 (STUSSI WILLIAM EUGENE); | [A]US2283302 (ALAN WEBB WELLS); | [A]US4952414 (KAUFMAN STEPHEN P [US], et al); | [A]EP0023152 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) |