EP0643768 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES AND TRANSGENIC ANIMALS TRANSFECTED THEREWITH HAVING REDUCED SENSITIVITY TO NARCOTIC ANALGESICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1999 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.1999 [1999/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUZ PARTNERSHIP 1830 Funston Avenue San Francisco, CA 94166 / US | [1995/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Nancy, M. 1830 Funston Avenue San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 02 /
LOH, Horace, H. 54 Mendosa San Francisco, CA 94116 / US | 03 /
LIPPMAN, David 1739 West Sonoma Avenue Stockton, CA 95204 / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Greaves, Carol Pauline Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | Greaves, Carol Pauline Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912092.9 | 29.03.1993 | [1995/12] | WO1993US02913 | Priority number, date | US19920866677 | 10.04.1992 Original published format: US 866677 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9321309 | Date: | 28.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643768 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.10.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N15/11, C07H15/12, C07H17/00, A61K31/70, A01K67/027, C12N5/10, C07K14/705 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP);
A01K67/0275 (EP);
C07K14/70503 (EP);
C12N15/8509 (EP);
A01K2217/05 (EP);
A01K2227/105 (EP);
A01K2267/03 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1995/12] | C12N15/00, C07H15/12, C07H17/00, A61K31/70 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | OLIGONUKLEOTIDSEQUENZEN UND TRANSGENE TIERE DIE DAMIT TRANSFEKTIERT WURDEN BESITZEN EINE REDUZIERTE SENSITIVITÄT GEGEN NARKKOTISCHE ANALGETIKA | [1995/12] | English: | OLIGONUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCES AND TRANSGENIC ANIMALS TRANSFECTED THEREWITH HAVING REDUCED SENSITIVITY TO NARCOTIC ANALGESICS | [1995/12] | French: | SEQUENCES D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES ET ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES TRANSFECTES AVEC CELLES-CI ET PRESENTANT UNE SENSIBILITE REDUITE AUX ANALGESIQUES NARCOTIQUES | [1995/12] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.1994 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.1994 | Search fee paid | 31.10.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.10.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 01.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/12] | 28.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA] - LIPPMAN, D.A. ET AL., "Opioid-binding cell adhesion molecule (OBCAM)-related clones from a rat brain cDNA library", GENE, AMSTERDAM NL, (19920815), vol. 117, no. 2, pages 249 - 254, XP000602047 [PA] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(92)90734-7 | [PX] - ANN D.K. ET AL., "Specific reduction of delta opioid receptor binding in transfected NG108-15 cells", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY (MICROFILMS), MD US, (19920415), vol. 267, no. 11, pages 7921 - 7926, XP000602135 [PX] 9-19 * the whole document * | [PX] - LANE, C.M. ET AL., "Regulation of an opioid-binding protein in NG108-15 cells parallels regulation of delta opioid receptors", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, WASHINGTON US, (19921201), vol. 89, no. 23, pages 11234 - 11238, XP000602145 [PX] 9-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.23.11234 | [T] - GOVITRAPONG, P. ET AL., "Transfection of NG108-15 cells with antisense opioid-binding cell adhesion molecule cDNA alters opioid receptor G-protein interaction", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY (MICROFILMS), MD US, (19930825), vol. 268, no. 24, pages 18280 - 18285, XP000602144 [T] 9-19 * the whole document * | [T] - CHAKRABORTI, A. ET AL., "Genetic mapping of opioid binding protein gene(s) to mouse chromosome 9", MAMMALIAN GENOME, (1993), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 179 - 182, XP000602417 [T] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00352235 | International search | [Y]US5087571 | [Y] - Advances in Genetics, Volume 24, issued 1987, G. SCANGOS et al., "Gene Transfer into Mice", pages 285-322, see entire document. | [Y] - Proceedings National Academy of Sciences, Volume 78, No. 11, issued November 1981, S.V. SUGGS et al., "Use of Synthetic Oligonucleotides as Hybridization Probes: Isolation of Cloned cDNA Sequences for Human beta2-Microglobulin", pages 6613-6617, especially page 6613, col. 1, lines 9-22. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, Volume 83, issued June 1986, T.M. CHO et al., "Purification to Apparent Homogeneity of a mu-Type Opiod Receptor from Rat Brain", pages 4138-4142, see entire document. | [Y] - Anti-Cancer Drug Design, Volume 2, issued 1987, P.S. MILLER et al., "A New Approach to Chemotherapy Based on Molecular Biology and Nucleic Acid Chemistry: Mutagen (Masking Tape for Gene Expression)", pages 117-123, see entire document. |