EP0655894 - IMPROVEMENTS IN WIPING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERKEN, Jacob Wilhelmus 17 Burns Crescent Chiswick, NSW 2046 / AU | [1995/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/23] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/23] | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al David Keltie Associates Audrey House Ely Place London EC1N 6SN / GB | Application number, filing date | 93912437.6 | 16.06.1993 | [1995/23] | WO1993AU00287 | Priority number, date | AU1992PL02982 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: AU PL298292 | [1995/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9326148 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0655894 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0655894 | Date: | 01.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 23.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A47L1/06, A47L1/08, A47L13/11, A47L13/20, A47L13/12 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
A47L1/06 (EP);
A47L13/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1995/23] | A47L1/06, A47L1/08, A47L13/11, A47L13/20 | Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/23] | Title | German: | WISCHER | [1995/23] | English: | IMPROVEMENTS IN WIPING DEVICES | [1995/23] | French: | AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES A DES USTENSILES DE NETTOYAGE | [1995/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1995 | Search fee paid | 13.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/23] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 26.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 24.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.09.1999 | DK | 01.12.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2002/23] | SE | 01.09.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4991246 (J.J. DECICCO) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 25 - column 3, line 7; figure - * | International search | [XY]GB2172836 ; | [Y]WO8910721 ; | [XY]EP0263456 ; | [XY]DE3823456 ; | [XY]WO9219142 ; | [XY]AU7337 ; | [Y]AU2341153 ; | [Y]DE1934380 ; | [Y]GB1471448 ; | [Y]FR756243 ; | [Y]FR1307919 ; | [Y]EP0074525 ; | [Y]US4124915 |