EP0602205 - TEMPERATURE-RESISTANT CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.02.1999 [1999/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1998/07] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIESE, Karl-Hermann Strohgaeustr. 13 D-7250 Leonberg / DE | [1994/25] | Application number, filing date | 93912595.1 | 18.06.1993 | [1994/25] | WO1993DE00524 | Priority number, date | DE19924221786 | 03.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4221786 | [1994/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401762 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0602205 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0602205 | Date: | 11.02.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/411, C04B35/48 | [1994/25] | CPC: |
C04B35/62813 (EP);
C01G25/02 (EP);
C04B35/486 (EP);
C04B35/4885 (EP);
C04B35/62665 (EP);
C04B35/628 (EP);
C04B35/62805 (EP);
C04B35/62815 (EP);
C04B35/62886 (EP);
G01N27/4073 (EP);
H01M8/1246 (EP);
C01P2004/61 (EP);
C01P2004/80 (EP);
C04B2235/3217 (EP);
C04B2235/3225 (EP);
C04B2235/3244 (EP);
C04B2235/5436 (EP);
C04B2235/5445 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/25] | Title | German: | TEMPERATURFESTE KERAMIK | [1994/25] | English: | TEMPERATURE-RESISTANT CERAMIC | [1994/25] | French: | CERAMIQUE RESISTANT AUX TEMPERATURES ELEVEES | [1994/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.02.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.02.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.02.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1994 | Examination requested [1994/25] | 15.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP63282124 ; | [AP]WO9212105 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0414575 (TONEN CORP [JP], et al); | [A]EP0209081 (NORTON CO [US]); | [A]GB2204030 (TIOXIDE GROUP PLC); | [A]EP0454138 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 241 (C-604) 6 June 1989 JP,A,1 051 377 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND. CO. LTD.) 27 February 1989 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 107 (C-576) 14 March 1989 & JP,A,63 282 124 (AGENCY OF IND. SCIENCE & TECHNOL.) 18 November 1988, & JP63282124 A 19881118 |