EP0652812 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PLACING A POURING BASIN ON A SAND MOULD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adolf Hottinger Maschinenbau GmbH Düsseldorfer Strasse 20-28 D-68219 Mannheim / DE | [1995/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANDUA, Werner Sandrain 41 D-68219 Mannheim / DE | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Naumann, Ulrich Ullrich & Naumann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Naumann, Ulrich, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Ullrich & Naumann, Gaisbergstrasse 3 D-69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 93912649.6 | 06.07.1993 | [1995/20] | WO1993DE00590 | Priority number, date | DE19924225577 | 03.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4225577 | [1995/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403293 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652812 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0652812 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B22C15/00, B22C9/08 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
B22C13/00 (EP);
B22C15/24 (EP);
B22C9/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1995/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINES GIESSTÜMPELS AUF EIN SANDPAKET | [1995/20] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PLACING A POURING BASIN ON A SAND MOULD | [1995/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LA FIXATION D'UN BASSIN DE COULEE SUR UN BLOC DE SABLE | [1995/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 08.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2198498 (HAGEMEYER) [A] 1 * page 1, column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 4 * * figure - * |