EP0652947 - ALKALINE PROTEASE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2001 [2001/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OUTTRUP, Helle Syvendehusvej 46 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | 02 /
DAMBMANN, Claus H je Gladsaxe 61, 7. t.h. DK-2860 S borg / DK | 03 /
AASLYNG, Dorrit Anita Gartnerkrogen 69 DK-3500 Vaerlose / DK | [1995/20] | Application number, filing date | 93912668.6 | 26.05.1993 | [1995/20] | WO1993DK00183 | Priority number, date | DK19920000702 | 27.05.1992 Original published format: DK 70292 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9324623 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652947 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0652947 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/54, C11D3/386 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/54 (EP,KR,US);
C11D3/386 (EP,US);
C12N15/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL [1995/20] | Title | German: | ALKALISCHE PROTEASE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [1995/20] | English: | ALKALINE PROTEASE AND PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION | [1995/20] | French: | PROTEASE ALCALINE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1995/20] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 16.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4480037 (ICHISHIMA FIJI [JP], et al); | [X]US4764470 (DURHAM DONALD R [US], et al); | [X]US4771003 (STELLWAG EDMUND J [US], et al); | [X]DE3328619 ; | [PX]WO9217576 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [PX]WO9217578 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]); | [PX]WO9217577 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) |