EP0648207 - VITAMIN D ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEO PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LTD. A/S (LOVENS KEMISKE FABRIK PRODUKTIONSAKTIESELSKAB) Industriparken 55 2750 Ballerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states LEO PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LTD. A/S (LOVENS KEMISKE FABRIK PRODUKTIONSAKTIESELSKAB) Industriparken 55 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRETTING, Claus, Aage, Svensgaard Smallegade 42, 4.sal, tv. DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/16] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93912681.9 | 07.06.1993 | [1995/16] | WO1993DK00196 | Priority number, date | GB19920014202 | 03.07.1992 Original published format: GB 9214202 | [1995/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401398 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648207 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648207 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00, A61K31/59 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | VITAMIN D DERIVATE | [1995/16] | English: | VITAMIN D ANALOGUES | [1995/16] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LA VITAMINE D | [1995/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.1994 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9203414 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY vol. 87, no. 16, 20 August 1965, WASHINGTON D.C., UNITED STATES CHAUDHURI, N. K. AND GUT, M. 'Acid-catalysed rearrangement of 20alpha-e thynylpregn-5-ene-3beta,20beta-diol 3-acetate' cited in the application |