Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0671948
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.06.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
27.06.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] |
18.06.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.04.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.01.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.11.1996 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] |
03.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
20.07.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.1996 |
First examination report |
|
30.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.08.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] |
04.08.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] |