Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9400575 | Global Dossier | 06.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07508648 | Global Dossier | 28.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301525 | 15.06.1993 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3755890B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2006 | B2 | JPH07508512 | 21.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0761231 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2000 | B1 | EP0761231 | 12.03.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP93912990 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0649470 | Global Dossier | 26.04.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301525 | 15.06.1993 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU676166B | Global Dossier | 06.03.1997 | B2 | AU4326493 | 24.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301525 | 15.06.1993 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU661404B | Global Dossier | 20.07.1995 | B2 | AU4326393 | 24.01.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1785597 | Global Dossier | 19.06.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0671948 | Global Dossier | 13.08.1997 | B1 | EP0671948 | 20.09.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2138996 | 06.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2138997 | 03.06.2003 | C | CA2138997 | 06.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1092812 | 28.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69313134T | 26.02.1998 | T2 | DE69313134D1 | 18.09.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI109767B | 15.10.2002 | B | FI946064 | 22.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9213559D0 | 12.08.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9226283D0 | 10.02.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9304056D0 | 14.04.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3025184T | 27.02.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GR3032742T | 30.06.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP93912990 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1010097 | 11.06.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU219808 | 28.08.2001 | B | HUT71208 | 28.11.1995 | A | HU9403778D0 | 28.02.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100278157B | 15.01.2001 | B1 | KR950702125 | 19.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR950702244 | 19.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301525 | 15.06.1993 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9303771 | 31.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO317546B | 15.11.2004 | B1 | NO945003L | 23.12.1994 | L | NO945003D0 | 23.12.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ253138 | 26.10.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL170980B | 28.02.1997 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA93140234 | 21.12.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SK279188B | 08.07.1998 | B6 | SK159294 | 09.08.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW269635B | 01.02.1996 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA40597 | 15.08.2001 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5750110 | 12.05.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7147862 | 12.12.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP9301524 | 15.06.1993 | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | US90987997 | 12.08.1997 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | US44228895 | 16.05.1995 | US35637295 | 17.02.1995 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9400153 | Global Dossier | 06.01.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AP408 | 27.09.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE156710T | 15.08.1997 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE188613T | 15.01.2000 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1122530C | 01.10.2003 | C | CN1086142 | 04.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ282235 | 11.06.1997 | B6 | CZ329694 | 16.08.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69327599T | 10.08.2000 | T2 | DE69327599D1 | 17.02.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0671948T | 01.09.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0761231T | 08.05.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2108278T | 16.12.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2143716T | 16.05.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1022074 | 21.07.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL106109 | 18.02.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA22911 | 31.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9303773 | 31.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY109278 | 31.12.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ253137 | 27.08.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT761231E | 30.06.2000 | E | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2118164 | 27.08.1998 | C1 | RU94046232 | 10.10.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG49909 | 15.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG90042 | 23.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI9300335 | 30.04.2003 | B | SI9300335 | 31.12.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9226283 | 17.12.1992 | GB9213559 | 25.06.1992 | GB9304056 | 01.03.1993 | Type | Divisional application | EP0761231 |