EP0644767 - VETERINARY REHYDRATION PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2016 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORBROOK LABORATORIES LIMITED Station Works Newry, County Down BT35 6JP / GB | [1995/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMES, Drew 9 Village Manor Bryansford, Newcastle BT33 0FL / GB | 02 /
PATTERSON, Alan 60 Quarry Road Belfast BT4 2NQ / GB | [1995/13] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [1995/13] | Ede, Eric Fitzpatricks, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 93913325.2 | 09.06.1993 | [1995/13] | WO1993GB01220 | Priority number, date | GB19920012737 | 16.06.1992 Original published format: GB 9212737 | [1995/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325214 | Date: | 23.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0644767 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0644767 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP0644767 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/14, A61K33/42, // (A61K33/42, 33:14, 31:70, 31:19) | [1995/13] | CPC: |
A61K33/14 (EP);
A61K33/42 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/14, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/14, A61K31/7004, A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K33/42, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/42, A61K33/14, A61K31/7004, A61K31/19 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/13] | Title | German: | VETERINAERPRODUKT ZUR REHYDRATION | [1995/13] | English: | VETERINARY REHYDRATION PRODUCT | [1995/13] | French: | PRODUIT VETERINAIRE DE REHYDRATATION | [1995/13] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/13] | 22.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 10.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Limitations: | 28.01.2008 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 10.10.2008 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]BE897402 (AESCULAAP BV); | [A]WO8501657 (VICTORIA STATE [AU]); | [A]WO8706832 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0459108 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]) |