26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
09.06.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] |
12.05.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.06.2000 [2000/26] |
17.09.1999 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.11.1999 [1999/44] |
25.06.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.08.1999 [1999/32] |
23.06.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.03.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.12.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
24.06.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
08.01.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.08.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
03.05.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.12.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.12.1996 |
First examination report |
|
18.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.04.1995 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |
19.04.1995 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] |
19.04.1995 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] |
10.02.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |
10.02.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] |