Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH07507237 | Global Dossier | 10.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US88483292 | 18.05.1992 | US9304685 | 18.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0641249 | Global Dossier | 08.03.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88483292 | 18.05.1992 | US9304685 | 18.05.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5376273 | 27.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US8230893 | 25.06.1993 | US88483292 | 18.05.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9323153 | Global Dossier | 25.11.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88483292 | 18.05.1992 |