EP0641174 - ELECTRODE SYSTEM WITH DISPOSABLE GEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXELGAARD, Jens 811 Tumbleweed Lane Fallbrook, CA 92028 / US | [1995/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/10] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93914108.1 | 20.05.1993 | [1995/10] | WO1993US04914 | Priority number, date | US19920887690 | 21.05.1992 Original published format: US 887690 | [1995/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9322966 | Date: | 25.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0641174 | Date: | 08.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0641174 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.11.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04, A61B5/0408 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
A61N1/0456 (EP,US);
A61B5/282 (EP,US);
A61N1/0452 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/10] | A61B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/10] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODEN-ANORDNUNG MIT EINMAL-GEL | [1995/10] | English: | ELECTRODE SYSTEM WITH DISPOSABLE GEL | [1995/10] | French: | SYSTEME D'ELECTRODES A GEL JETABLE | [1995/10] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1994 | Search fee paid | 19.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 19.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/10] | 04.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2000 | CH | 09.08.2000 | ES | 09.08.2000 | IT | 09.08.2000 | LI | 09.08.2000 | NL | 09.08.2000 | DK | 09.11.2000 | SE | 09.11.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
NL | 09.08.2000 | ||
DK | 09.11.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
NL | 09.08.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
ES | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2002/02] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
CH | 09.08.2000 | ||
LI | 09.08.2000 | ||
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/27] | AT | 09.08.2000 | |
SE | 09.11.2000 | ||
Former [2001/17] | AT | 09.08.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3989035 (ZUEHLSDORFF WERNER G) [A] 1,3,15 * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 4, line 20 - line 42 * * column 5, line 17 - line 51 *; | [X]US3993049 (KATER JOHN A R) [X] 1,2,14,22 * column 5, line 22 - line 26 * * column 7, line 30 - column 8, line 13 *; | [A]US4066078 (BERG JEFFREY) [A] 1,4,6,11,17,19 * column 2, line 19 - line 38 ** column 3, line 50 - column 4, line 19 *; | [A]US4239046 (ONG LINCOLN T [US]) [A] 1,4-7,17-20,22,10-12 * column 3, line 19 - line 56 * * column 4, line 13 - column 5, line 31 *; | [XA]EP0194823 (NDM CORP [US]) [X] 1,22 * column 1, line 52 - line 66 * * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 20 * [A] 10,11,17; | [YA]EP0212096 (AXELGAARD JENS [US], et al) [Y] 1,10,17 * & US-A-4 708 149 (J. AXELGAARD et al.), cited by the applicant; page 7, line 29 - page 11, line 26 * [A] 4,11,21,22; | [X]WO9001898 (GROEGER JEFFREY S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,14,22 * page 1, line 20 - line 34 * * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 20 *; | [YA]EP0457529 (SMITH & NEPHEW UNITED INC [US]) [Y] 1,10,17 * page 3, line 33 - line 43 * * page 4, line 41 - line 52 * [A] 3,15 | International search | [YA]US4121575 (MILLS HAROLD, et al); | [YA]US4381012 (RUSSEK ALLEN S); | [Y]US4777954 (KEUSCH PRESTON [US], et al) |