EP0643883 - SUB-NANOSCALE ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/12] | SUB-NANOSCALE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, DEVICES AND PROCESSES | ||
[2003/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Office of Cooperative Research Suite 401 246 Church Street New Haven, CT 06510 / US | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH CAROLINA Osborne Administration Building Columbia, SC 29208 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/12] | For all designated states YALE UNIVERSITY Office of Cooperative Research, Suite 401, 246 Church Street New Haven, CT 06510 / US | ||
For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH CAROLINA Osborne Administration Building Columbia, SC 29208 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Mark, A. 330 Willow Street New Haven, CT 06511 / US | 02 /
TOUR, James, M. 3700 Linbrook Drive Columbia, SC 29204 / US | [1995/12] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Betten & Resch Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/12] | Harris, Ian Richard, et al c/o D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 93914286.5 | 01.06.1993 | [1995/12] | WO1993US05185 | Priority number, date | US19920891605 | 01.06.1992 Original published format: US 891605 | US19920893092 | 01.06.1992 Original published format: US 893092 | [1995/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9325003 | Date: | 09.12.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0643883 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0643883 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/84, H01L21/265, H01L51/20, G02B27/00 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
H01L27/02 (EP);
H01L29/7606 (EP);
H01L29/882 (EP);
H10K10/701 (EP);
H10K85/113 (EP);
H10K85/40 (EP);
H10K85/615 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/33] | H03K17/84, H01L21/265, H01L29/28, G02B27/00, H01L31/0344 | ||
Former IPC [1997/16] | H03K17/84, H01L21/265, H01L29/28, G02B27/00, H01L51/00 | ||
Former IPC [1995/12] | H03K17/84, H01L21/265, H01L29/28, G02B27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/12] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHER SCHALTKREIS IM NANOBEREICH UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2003/10] | English: | SUB-NANOSCALE ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT AND PROCESS FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2003/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTRONIQUE A ECHELLE SUBNANOMETRIQUE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2003/10] |
Former [1995/12] | ELEKTRONISCHE SYSTEME, VORRICHTUNGEN UND PROZESSE IN SUBNANOSEKUNDENBEREICH | ||
Former [1995/12] | SUB-NANOSCALE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS, DEVICES AND PROCESSES | ||
Former [1995/12] | SYSTEMES ELECTRONIQUES A ECHELLE SUBNANOMETRIQUE, PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIFS | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 12.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 23.08.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.2003 | BE | 01.10.2003 | CH | 01.10.2003 | IT | 01.10.2003 | LI | 01.10.2003 | NL | 01.10.2003 | DK | 01.01.2004 | GR | 01.01.2004 | SE | 01.01.2004 | ES | 12.01.2004 | PT | 01.03.2004 | IE | 01.06.2004 | LU | 01.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/05] |
Former [2005/24] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
IE | 01.06.2004 | ||
LU | 01.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
LU | 01.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
BE | 01.10.2003 | ||
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
ES | 12.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
DK | 01.01.2004 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
CH | 01.10.2003 | ||
LI | 01.10.2003 | ||
NL | 01.10.2003 | ||
GR | 01.01.2004 | ||
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 01.10.2003 | |
SE | 01.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 01.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4804930 (SIMIC-GLAVASKI BRANIMIR [US]) [A] 6-14 * the whole document *; | [A] - FICHOU D ET AL, "Extended oligothiophenes: new materials for molecular electronics", 5TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON UNCONVENTIONAL PHOTOACTIVE SOLIDS. MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, OKAZAKI, JAPAN, 13-17 OCT. 1991, ISSN 0026-8941, MOLECULAR CRYSTALS AND LIQUID CRYSTALS, 1992, UK, vol. 216-218, pages 193 - 196 vol.217, XP000617711 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - ROTH S, "Conductive polymers in molecular electronics: conductivity and photoconductivity", SCIENCE AND APPLICATIONS OF CONDUCTING POLYMERS. PAPERS FROM THE 6TH EUROPEAN PHYSICAL SOCIETY INDUSTRIAL WORKSHOP, LOFTHUS, NORWAY, 28-31 MAY 1990, ISBN 0-7503-0049-3, 1991, BRISTOL, UK, ADAM HILGER, UK, pages 129 - 139, XP000617697 [A] 1 * page 132, paragraph 3 * | [A] - SIGMUND E ET AL, "MOLECULAR ELECTRONICS: THE FIRST STEPS TOWARDS A NEW TECHNOLOGY", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, (19900701), vol. 69, no. 1, pages 145 - 152, XP000138364 [A] 6-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00207219008920301 | [AP] - ROTH S, "MICROSWITCHES IN MOLECULAR ELECTRONICS - FROM MOLECULAR CONDUCTORS TO MOLECULAR ELECTRONICS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS, (199211), vol. 73, no. 5, pages 1019 - 1026, XP000616803 [AP] 6-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4427840 (WALDROP JAMES R [US], et al); | [Y]US4761677 (SASAKI NOBUO [JP]); | [Y]JPS6444061 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JPS6444062 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JPH0318068 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [A]US5107308 (KOEZUKA HIROSHI [JP], et al) | [X] - HOROWITZ et al., "The Art of Electronic", Cambridge University Press, 1980, pages 323-324, fig. 8.9. | Examination | - "MOLECULAR ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT DEVICE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19890201), vol. 31, no. 9, pages 444 - 450, XP000111655 |