EP0654980 - CLEANING TOOL AND ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN TOOTH-CLEANING INSTRUMENT USING SUCH A TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): IE | published on 06.03.2002 [2002/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1995/22] | For all designated states Braun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACZEK, Werner Obere Baustrasse 4 D-90478 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
BOLAND, Bernhard Am Stiegelschlag 12 D-60385 Frankfurt / DE | 03 /
HILFINGER, Peter Gartenfeldstrasse 83 D-61350 Bad Homburg / DE | 04 /
SCHWARZ-HARTMANN, Armin Brunnengasse 2 D-55234 Albig / DE | [1995/22] | Application number, filing date | 93914602.3 | 03.07.1993 | [1995/22] | WO1993DE00596 | Priority number, date | DE19924226659 | 12.08.1992 Original published format: DE 4226659 | DE19934309078 | 20.03.1993 Original published format: DE 4309078 | [1995/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404093 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0654980 | Date: | 31.05.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0654980 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/16, A61C15/00 | [1995/22] | CPC: |
A61C15/00 (EP,US);
A61C17/26 (EP,US);
A61C2204/002 (EP);
B29L2031/425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/22] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSWERKZEUG UND ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENES ZAHNREINIGUNGSGERÄT | [1995/22] | English: | CLEANING TOOL AND ELECTRICALLY DRIVEN TOOTH-CLEANING INSTRUMENT USING SUCH A TOOL | [1995/22] | French: | INSTRUMENT DE NETTOYAGE ET APPAREIL DE DETARTRAGE DENTAIRE ELECTRIQUE | [1995/22] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.1994 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.1994 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 30.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 15.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 09.09.1998 | IE | 04.05.1999 | [2002/10] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 09.09.1998 | |
IE | 09.09.1998 | ||
Former [2000/20] | IE | 09.09.1998 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3091033 (ELLMAN IRVING A); | [X]US3472045 (NELSEN ALICE E, et al); | [A]US3552022 (AXELSSON PER AXEL TORBJORN); | [A]EP0028530 (SYNTEX INC [US]); | [X]DD258566 (SCHNEIDER HANS GEORG [DD]); | [A]DE4005625 |