EP0620783 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A FLEXIBLE, DIMENSIONALLY STABLE STENCIL CARRIER FOR SCREEN-PROCESS PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holderegger, Jürg Wartstrasse 23 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | [1994/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/43] | Representative(s) | Gäbel, Walter Wingertstrasse 17 8542 Wiesendangen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | Gäbel, Walter Dr. Wingertstrasse 17 CH-8542 Wiesendangen / CH | Application number, filing date | 93915631.1 | 11.08.1993 | [1994/43] | WO1993CH00201 | Priority number, date | CH19920002567 | 18.08.1992 Original published format: CH 256792 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404361 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0620783 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0620783 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/14 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
B41C1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN UND DIMENSIONSSTABILEN SCHABLONENTRÄGERS FÜR DEN SIEBDRUCK | [1994/43] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A FLEXIBLE, DIMENSIONALLY STABLE STENCIL CARRIER FOR SCREEN-PROCESS PRINTING | [1994/43] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN PORTE-ECRAN FLEXIBLE ET DE DIMENSIONS STABLES POUR LA SERIGRAPHIE | [1994/43] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/43] | 02.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 27.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1997
24.12.1997
WITHDRAWN Sefar AG - 9425 Thal/SG / CH Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al, et al Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1997
24.12.1997
WITHDRAWN Sefar AG - 9425 Thal/SG / CH Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al, et al Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | ||
Former [1997/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
23.07.1997
24.12.1997
WITHDRAWN Sefar AG - 9425 Thal/SG / CH Opponent's representative Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al, et al Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | 04.09.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.04.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.05.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/39] | Request for further processing for: | 30.11.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 18.12.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.10.1996 | NL | 23.10.1996 | ES | 24.01.1997 | GB | 11.08.1997 | CH | 31.08.1997 | LI | 31.08.1997 | FR | 30.04.1998 | DE | 01.05.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/08] | IT | 23.10.1996 | |
NL | 23.10.1996 | ||
GB | 11.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 23.10.1996 | |
GB | 11.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | GB | 11.08.1997 | |
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
FR | 30.04.1998 | ||
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | GB | 11.08.1997 | |
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | GB | 11.08.1997 | |
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | GB | 11.08.1997 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1261129 (BALCO FILTERTECHNIK G.M.B.H.) [X] 1-20 * column 4, line 17 - column 5, line 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4209582 (R.E.MERRILL ET AL.) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 6 - line 33; figures 7-10 *; | [A]JPS599057 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840428), vol. 8, no. 94, Database accession no. (M - 293)<1581> , & JP59009057 A 19840118 (KURANOSUKE ITOU) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | Examination | JPS599057 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8no. 94 (M-293)(1581) 28. April 1984 & JP-A-59 009 057 |