Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0602231
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
04.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
04.07.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] |
06.06.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] |
25.04.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.1997 [1997/24] |
14.03.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] |
12.07.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.08.1996 [1996/35] |
02.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.02.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.01.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.1995 |
First examination report |
|
17.08.1994 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] |
06.05.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |
06.05.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.06.1994 [1994/25] |