EP0648166 - PROCESS AND CIRCUITRY FOR SUPPLYING SIGNALS TO LOUDSPEAKERS AND OTHER ELECTRIC CONSUMERS ARRANGED IN VEHICLE DOORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DODUCO GmbH Im Altgefäll 12 75181 Pforzheim / DE | [1998/19] |
Former [1997/21] | For all designated states DODUCO GMBH + Co Dr. Eugen Dürrwächter i.K. Im Altgefäll 12 75181 Pforzheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/16] | For all designated states DODUCO GMBH + Co Dr. Eugen Dürrwächter Im Altgefäll 12 D-75181 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEY, Joachim Ob der Linden 50 D-75223 Niefern / DE | 02 /
NORMANN, Norbert Panoramastrasse 12 D-75223 Niefern-Öschelbronn / DE | 03 /
SCHULZE, Gunter, Lothar Lutherstrasse 3 D-75228 Ispringen / DE | 04 /
UHL, Günter Hauptstrasse 88 D-74921 Helmstadt-Bargen / DE | [1995/16] | Representative(s) | Twelmeier, Ulrich, et al porta patentanwälte Twelmeier - Leitner Zerrennerstrasse 23-25 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl. Phys., et al porta patentanwälte Dipl.-Phys. U. Twelmeier Dr. techn. W. Leitner Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Str. 29-31 75172 Pforzheim / DE | ||
Former [1995/16] | Twelmeier, Ulrich, Dipl.Phys., et al Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 29-31 D-75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 93915822.6 | 07.07.1993 | [1995/16] | WO1993EP01757 | Priority number, date | DE19924222321 | 08.07.1992 Original published format: DE 4222321 | [1995/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401304 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0648166 | Date: | 19.04.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0648166 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.01.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02, H04B1/20 | [1995/16] | CPC: |
H04B1/20 (EP,US);
H04B1/205 (EP,US);
B60R16/0315 (EP,US);
H04B1/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1995/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM VERSORGEN VON LAUTSPRECHERN UND ANDEREN ELEKTRISCHEN VERBRAUCHERN IN FAHRZEUGTÜREN MIT SIGNALEN | [1995/16] | English: | PROCESS AND CIRCUITRY FOR SUPPLYING SIGNALS TO LOUDSPEAKERS AND OTHER ELECTRIC CONSUMERS ARRANGED IN VEHICLE DOORS | [1995/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET CIRCUITS D'ALIMENTATION EN SIGNAUX DE HAUT-PARLEURS ET D'AUTRES CONSOMMATEURS ELECTRIQUES SITUES DANS DES PORTES DE VEHICULES | [1995/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/16] | 20.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/09] | Request for further processing for: | 10.10.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.1995 | 31.07.1996 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 31.08.1996 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | 24.06.1997 | Resumption of proceedings | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.03.1998 | [2003/08] | Cited in | International search | [A]US4176250 (BERGLIND BRADFORD L [US]); | [A]DE3303011 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [A]EP0277014 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0393233 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]); | [A]EP0457673 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [AP]EP0519111 (BECKER AUTORADIO [DE]) |