EP0650343 - FLOWMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTG INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 10 Fleet Place London EC4M 7SB / GB | ||
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states BRITISH TECHNOLOGY GROUP LIMITED 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKIDMORE, Robert 2 Croft Close Bitton, Bristol BS15 6 HF / GB | [1995/18] | Representative(s) | Bird, Christopher John, et al British Technology Group Patents Department 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/50] | Bird, Christopher John, et al British Technology Group Patents Department 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | ||
Former [1995/18] | Parker, Geoffrey Patents Department British Technology Group Ltd 101 Newington Causeway London SE1 6BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 93916091.7 | 16.07.1993 | [1995/18] | WO1993GB01498 | Priority number, date | GB19920015231 | 17.07.1992 Original published format: GB 9215231 | [1995/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9402069 | Date: | 03.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0650343 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0650343 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06, A61B8/08 | [1995/18] | CPC: |
A61B8/065 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/18] | Title | German: | STRÖMUNGSMESSER | [1995/18] | English: | FLOWMETERS | [1995/18] | French: | DEBIMETRES | [1995/18] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/18] | 03.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0329492 (ANGELSEN BJORN A J [NO], et al); | [Y]US4546771 (EGGLETON REGINALD C [US], et al); | [A]US4317370 (GLENN WILLIAM E); | [A]US4757823 (HOFMEISTER JOHN F [US], et al); | [A]US4509526 (BARNES STEPHEN R [US], et al) |