EP0604633 - A MULTIFUNCTIONAL MACHINE FOR THE JOINING CALENDERING, CUTTING AND REWINDING OF FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOSI, Bruno Strada di Selvamaggio, 82/A I-53034 Colle Val D'Elsa / IT | [1994/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/32] | Celestino, Marco ABM, Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi, Via A. Della Spina 40 56125 Pisa / IT | ||
Former [1994/27] | Bardini, Marco Luigi, et al c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Corso dei Tintori, 25 I-50122 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 93916153.5 | 22.07.1993 | [1994/27] | WO1993IT00081 | Priority number, date | IT1992FI00153 | 22.07.1992 Original published format: IT FI920153 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9402309 | Date: | 03.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604633 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0604633 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B31D1/02, B65H39/14 | [1994/27] | CPC: |
B65H39/14 (EP);
B31D1/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/27] | Title | German: | VIELZWECKSVORRICHTUNG ZUM VERBINDEN, KALANDERN, SCHNEIDEN UND WIEDER AUFWICKELN VON FOLIENBAHNEN | [1994/27] | English: | A MULTIFUNCTIONAL MACHINE FOR THE JOINING CALENDERING, CUTTING AND REWINDING OF FILMS | [1994/27] | French: | MACHINE MULTIFONCTIONS POUR LE CALANDRAGE, LA COUPE ET LE REMBOBINAGE DE FILMS | [1994/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/38] | 19.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.10.1996 | BE | 02.10.1996 | CH | 02.10.1996 | DK | 02.10.1996 | LI | 02.10.1996 | NL | 02.10.1996 | PT | 02.01.1997 | SE | 02.01.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
DK | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
PT | 02.01.1997 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
CH | 02.10.1996 | ||
LI | 02.10.1996 | ||
PT | 02.01.1997 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/50] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
PT | 02.01.1997 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/39] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
SE | 02.01.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | AT | 02.10.1996 | |
BE | 02.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | AT | 02.10.1996 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2496552 (STOULS ETS H [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP0154057 (INSTANCE DAVID JOHN) [A] 1 * the whole document * |