EP0665811 - A PROCESS FOR FILLING CONTAINERS, IN PARTICULAR CANS, WITH LIQUIDS, AND A FILLER VALVE GROUP FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SASIB BEVERAGE S.p.A. Via la Spezia 241/A 43100 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/12] | For all designated states SASIB BEVERAGE S.p.A. Via la Spezia 241/A I-43100 Parma / IT | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states SIMONAZZI S.p.A. Via la Spezia 241/A I-43100 Parma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONFORTI, Lucio Località Provinciale, 8 bis I-43045 Fornovo Taro / IT | [1995/32] | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano BUGNION S.p.A. Largo Michele Novaro 1/A 43121 Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Garibaldi, 22 I-43100 Parma / IT | Application number, filing date | 93916154.3 | 22.07.1993 | [1995/32] | WO1993IT00082 | Priority number, date | IT1992PR00046 | 30.10.1992 Original published format: IT PR920046 | IT1993PR00014 | 16.04.1993 Original published format: IT PR930014 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410079 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665811 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665811 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/26 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
B67C3/2628 (EP,US);
B67C2003/2651 (EP,US);
B67C2003/2657 (EP,US);
B67C2003/2665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1995/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÜLLEN VON BEHÄLTERN, INSBESONDERE DOSEN, MIT FLÜSSIGKEIT UND VENTILEINHEIT ZUM DURCHFÜHREN DES VERFAHRENS | [1995/32] | English: | A PROCESS FOR FILLING CONTAINERS, IN PARTICULAR CANS, WITH LIQUIDS, AND A FILLER VALVE GROUP FOR CARRYING OUT THE PROCESS | [1995/32] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REMPLIR DES RECIPIENTS AVEC DES LIQUIDES, EN PARTICULIER DES CANETTES, ET SYSTEME DE VALVE DE REMPLISSAGE POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE LE PROCEDE | [1995/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 18.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 22.05.1996 | NL | 22.05.1996 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | ES | 22.05.1996 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2325419 (MINARD EVERETT S) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 9,11; | [Y]DE2259275 (HOLSTEIN & KAPPERT MASCHF) [Y] 11 * figure - *; | [YD]EP0080774 (CROWN CORK & SEAL CO [US]) [YD] 9 * figures 4,5 *; | [XD]EP0154050 (CROWN CORK & SEAL CO [US]) [XD] 2,6 * the whole document *; | US4986318 [ ] (YUN CHUNG J [US]); | [X]EP0412480 (ALFILL GETRAENKETECHNIK [DE]) [X] 2,7* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]EP0453879 (ALFILL GETRAENKETECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * |