EP0604638 - FLUID PRESSURE INTENSIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.1997 | Refusal of application | published on 13.08.1997 [1997/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRINGLE, Bette 999 Lake Shore Road Grosse Pinte shores, MI 48236 / US | [1994/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRINGLE, William, L. +di / / US | [1994/27] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 93916610.4 | 16.06.1993 | [1994/27] | WO1993US05842 | Priority number, date | US19920909598 | 07.07.1992 Original published format: US 909598 | [1994/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9401309 | Date: | 20.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0604638 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.01.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/12, F15B11/032 | [1994/50] | CPC: |
B60T11/16 (EP,US);
B60T11/12 (EP,US);
F15B3/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/27] | B60T7/00, F15B7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1994/27] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSDRUCKVERSTÄRKER | [1994/27] | English: | FLUID PRESSURE INTENSIFIER | [1994/27] | French: | MULTIPLICATEUR DE PRESSION D'UN FLUIDE | [1994/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.1994 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.1994 | Search fee paid | 11.03.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.1994 | Examination requested [1994/36] | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1997/33] | 29.03.1997 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.08.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4255931 (LEIBER HEINZ, et al); | [A]US4255930 (NATALIE ADAM J); | [A]US4026109 (FAY CLARENCE C); | [A]US2396539 (STANLEY SMITH, et al); | [A]US5107681 (WOLFBAUER III MICHAEL H [US]); | [A]US4961317 (WOLFBAUER III MICHAEL H [US]) |