EP0647126 - MIXING AND DELIVERY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2001 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENCE INCORPORATED 8200 Normadale Boulevard, Suite 323 Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/08] | For all designated states SCIENCE INCORPORATED 8200 Normandale Boulevard, Suite 323 Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | ||
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states SCIENCE INCORPORATED 8200 Normandie Boulevard, Suite 323 Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRIESEL, Marshall, S. 8200 Normandale Boulevard Suite 323 Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Thomas, N. 8200 Normandale Boulevard Suite 323 Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | [1995/15] | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 93916742.5 | 24.06.1993 | [1995/15] | WO1993US06050 | Priority number, date | US19920903651 | 24.06.1992 Original published format: US 903651 | US19930989097 | 01.02.1993 Original published format: US 989097 | [1995/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9400070 | Date: | 06.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0647126 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0647126 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.01.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61M5/32, A61J1/00 | [1995/21] | CPC: |
A61J1/2089 (EP,US);
A61K47/6957 (EP,US);
A61J1/10 (EP,US);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2041 (EP,US);
A61J1/2058 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/15] | A61B19/00, A61M5/32 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/15] | Title | German: | MISCH- UND ABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [1995/15] | English: | MIXING AND DELIVERY SYSTEM | [1995/15] | French: | SYSTEME DE MELANGE ET D'ADMINISTRATION | [1995/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.1994 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.1994 | Search fee paid | 19.12.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 19.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/15] | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.1997 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 08.03.2000 | ES | 08.03.2000 | IT | 08.03.2000 | LI | 08.03.2000 | NL | 08.03.2000 | SE | 08.03.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
NL | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
ES | 08.03.2000 | ||
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
SE | 08.03.2000 | ||
Former [2001/16] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
LI | 08.03.2000 | ||
FR | 04.08.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 08.03.2000 | |
LI | 08.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4614207 (STEINHAGEN THOMAS C [US]); | [X]US4784658 (GRABENKORT RICHARD W [US]); | [AP]US5217433 (BUNIN LEONID [US]) |