EP0652907 - PERMANENT AQUEOUS MARKER INKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Berol Corporation 29 E. Stephenson Street Freeport, IL 61032 / US | [2001/24] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states THE GILLETTE COMPANY Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOFTIN, Rachel, M. 9 Doris Road Halifax, MA 02338-1149 / US | 02 /
SANBORN, Kimberly, Borelli 20 Sheri Lane South Weymouth, MA 02190 / US | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/20] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93917143.5 | 13.07.1993 | [1995/20] | WO1993US06571 | Priority number, date | US19920917455 | 21.07.1992 Original published format: US 917455 | US19920968001 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: US 968001 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9402542 | Date: | 03.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652907 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.02.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/02, C08K5/06, C08K5/24 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
C09D11/16 (EP,US);
Y10S260/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1995/45] |
Former [1995/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | DAUERHAFTE WÄSSRIGE BESCHRIFTUNGSTINTEN | [1995/20] | English: | PERMANENT AQUEOUS MARKER INKS | [1995/20] | French: | ENCRES AQUEUSES INDELEBILES POUR MARQUEURS | [1995/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.1995 | Search fee paid | 14.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 22.02.1995 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL | 11.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2002/11] | 10.11.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/11] | Appeal following examination | 05.03.2001 | Appeal received No. T0851/01 | 15.10.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Request for further processing for: | 16.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 16.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.2000 | Decision despatched | 27.11.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 27.11.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 15.12.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.04.1995 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.04.1995 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4353745 (EBBELER ROBERT E) [X] 1-15 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 5 *; | [X]US4786198 (ZGAMBO THOMAS P [US]) [X] 1-16 * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-35 *; | [X]GB2224737 (SAKURA COLOR PROD CORP [JP]) [X] 1-16 * page 14, line 15 - line 25 * * page 18, line 11 - page 23, line 1 * * claims 1-17 * | International search | [X]US4606842 (KEYES GEORGE B [US], et al); | [Y]GB1337467 (DOW CORNING LTD); | [X]US5114479 (KEAVENEY WILLIAM P [US], et al); | [Y]US5106417 (HAUSER HANSPETER [CH], et al); | [Y]JPS59120667 (PENTEL KK); | [X]EP0294044 (DOW CORNING [US]) |