EP0651885 - AERODYNAMICALLY SHAPED PROBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2000 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2000 [2000/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The B.F. GOODRICH Company 4020 Kinross Lakes Parkway Richfield Ohio 44286 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states The B.F. Goodrich Company 4020 Kinross Lakes Parkway Richfield, Ohio 44286 / US | ||
Former [1995/19] | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDBERG, Eric, A. 1021 Lincoln Avenue St. Paul, MN 55105 / US | 02 /
SETTERHOLM, Jeffrey, M. 8095 East 230th Street Lakeville, MN 55044 / US | [1995/19] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93917151.8 | 13.07.1993 | [1995/19] | WO1993US06582 | Priority number, date | US19920916498 | 20.07.1992 Original published format: US 916498 | [1995/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9402858 | Date: | 03.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0651885 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0651885 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01P5/165 | [1995/19] | CPC: |
G01P5/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/19] | Title | German: | AERODYNAMISCH GEFORMTE STRÖMUNGSSONDE | [1995/19] | English: | AERODYNAMICALLY SHAPED PROBE | [1995/19] | French: | SONDE AERODYNAMIQUE | [1995/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/19] | 30.08.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB857427 (AVIMO LTD); | [A]US3030807 (SCADRON MARVIN D); | [A]WO8607465 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) |