blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0650484

EP0650484 - ENDOTHELIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip24.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.01.2001 [2001/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia, PA 19101 / US
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza, P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19101 / US
Former [1995/18]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
UW2220, 709 Swedeland Road, P.O. Box 1539
King of Prussia, PA 19406-0939 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRYAN, Deborah, Lynne
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
02 / ELLIOT, John, Duncan
709 Swedeland Road
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
[1999/39]
Former [1995/18]01 / BRYAN, Deborah, Lynne
341 Mac Kenzie Drive
West Chester, PA 19380 / US
02 / ELLIOT, John, Duncan
723 Old Eagle School Road
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
Representative(s)Florence, Julia Anne, et al
SmithKline Beecham plc
Corporate Intellectual Property
Two New Horizons Court
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB
[N/P]
Former [1995/18]Florence, Julia Anne, et al
SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property SB House Great West Road
Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9BD / GB
Application number, filing date93917208.615.07.1993
[1995/18]
WO1993US06667
Priority number, dateUS1992091605117.07.1992         Original published format: US 916051
US1993004960619.04.1993         Original published format: US 49606
[1995/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9402474
Date:03.02.1994
Language:EN
[1994/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0650484
Date:03.05.1995
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1995/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0650484
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.02.1994
ClassificationIPC:C07D317/60, C07D405/06, C07F7/08, A61K31/36, A61K31/415
[1995/18]
CPC:
C07D405/06 (EP); A61P13/02 (EP); A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP); A61P9/00 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D317/60 (EP); C07F7/0812 (EP); C07F9/65517 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1995/18]
TitleGerman:ENDOTHELIN REZEPTOR ANTAGONISTEN[1995/18]
English:ENDOTHELIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS[1995/18]
French:ANTAGONISTES DU RECEPTEUR DE L'ENDOTHELINE[1995/18]
Entry into regional phase27.01.1995National basic fee paid 
27.01.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
27.01.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.02.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/18]
06.06.1997Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
02.03.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.08.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.02.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
08.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
16.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.1999Fee for grant paid
13.10.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2001/02]
Request for further processing for:02.03.1998Request for further processing filed
02.03.1998Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
23.03.1998Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
07.07.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0403158  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 23 - page 27; claim - *
 [A]  - TH.F.BUCKLEY III ET AL., "DEPENDENCE OF ARYL ETHER ACYLATION UPON LEWIS ACID STOICHIOMETRY", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY., GASTON, PA US, (1980), vol. 102, no. 9, pages 3056 - 3062 [A] 1 * page 3059 - page 3061; example 13B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.