Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0652700
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.08.1998 |
Refusal of application |
published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] |
13.05.1998 |
Application refused |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
08.08.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.03.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
21.01.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
14.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
14.01.1997 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
25.10.1996 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
26.07.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
06.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.03.1995 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] |
31.03.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] |