Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9417653 | Global Dossier | 18.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5890194 | Global Dossier | 29.08.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9400176 | 28.01.1994 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU4718293 | Global Dossier | 14.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9301603 | 28.07.1993 | GB9217071 | 12.08.1992 | GB9216085 | 28.07.1992 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0652700 | Global Dossier | 17.05.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9301603 | 28.07.1993 | GB9217071 | 12.08.1992 | GB9216085 | 28.07.1992 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4404225 | 18.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9402212U | 14.07.1994 | U1 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2701451 | 28.04.1995 | B3 | FR2701451 | 19.08.1994 | A3 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2701452 | 15.09.1995 | B1 | FR2701452 | 19.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2275037 | 31.07.1996 | B | GB2275037 | 17.08.1994 | A | GB9400783D0 | 16.03.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9400783 | 17.01.1994 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9216085D0 | 09.09.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9216085 | 28.07.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9217071D0 | 23.09.1992 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9217071 | 12.08.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9302996D0 | 31.03.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9311563D0 | 21.07.1993 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO953116L | 10.10.1995 | L | NO953116D0 | 09.08.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | GB9400176 | 28.01.1994 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5740662 | 21.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9311563 | 04.06.1993 | US50734595 | 15.08.1995 | GB9400176 | 28.01.1994 | US71372396 | 13.09.1996 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9401997 | Global Dossier | 03.02.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9217071 | 12.08.1992 | GB9216085 | 28.07.1992 | GB9302996 | 15.02.1993 |