EP0653115 - POLARITY REVERSING DC POWER SUPPLY FOR REMOTELY LOCATED EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTIFIC-ATLANTA, INC. One Technology Parkway South Norcross, GA 30092-2967 / US | [1995/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEST, Lamar, E., Jr. Route 2, Box 2927 Maysville, GA 30558 / US | [1995/20] | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 93918255.6 | 20.07.1993 | [1995/20] | WO1993US06797 | Priority number, date | US19920923359 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: US 923359 | [1995/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403963 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0653115 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0653115 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.02.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H02M7/538, H02M5/458, H04N7/16, H04B3/44 | [1995/41] | CPC: |
H02M7/538 (EP,US);
H04B3/44 (EP,US);
H04N7/10 (EP,US);
H04H20/78 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/20] | H02M7/538 | Designated contracting states | GB [1995/20] | Title | German: | GLEICHSTROMSCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT POLARITÄTSUMKEHRUNG FÜR ENTFERNT GELEGENE EINRICHTUNGEN | [1995/20] | English: | POLARITY REVERSING DC POWER SUPPLY FOR REMOTELY LOCATED EQUIPMENT | [1995/20] | French: | ALIMENTATION EN COURANT CONTINU A INVERSION DE POLARITE POUR MATERIEL SITUE A DISTANCE | [1995/20] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.1995 | Search fee paid | 23.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 12.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0158089 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [XY]US3987240 (SCHULTZ ROBERT T) |