EP0659241 - COMPRESSED-AIR ACTUATED DISC BRAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Nutzfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE SYSTEME FÜR NUTZFAHRZEUGE GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 D-80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARTL, Michael Heimeranstr. 2 D-80339 München / DE | [1995/26] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 D-85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 93918894.2 | 18.08.1993 | [1995/26] | WO1993DE00751 | Priority number, date | DE19924230004 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4230004 | [1995/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405925 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0659241 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0659241 | Date: | 13.03.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/16, F16D55/226 | [1995/26] | CPC: |
F16D65/183 (EP);
F16D65/568 (EP);
F16D2121/14 (EP);
F16D2125/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/26] | Title | German: | DRUCKLUFTBETÄTIGTE SCHEIBENBREMSE | [1995/26] | English: | COMPRESSED-AIR ACTUATED DISC BRAKE | [1995/26] | French: | FREIN A DISQUE A AIR COMPRIME | [1995/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/26] | 14.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.03.1996 | GB | 13.03.1996 | IT | 13.03.1996 | SE | 13.06.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 13.03.1996 | |
IT | 13.03.1996 | ||
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | GB | 13.03.1996 | |
SE | 13.06.1996 | ||
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | SE | 13.06.1996 | |
FR | 09.08.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 13.06.1996 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE2618966 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH); | [Y]DE4032885 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]); | [A]DE3025882 (KNOTT EGGSTAETT ING VALENTIN K [DE]); | [A]DE3716202 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]); | [AE]DE4212384 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]); | [A]GB2114692 (VALEO); | [A]US3613837 (TSUBOUCHI KAORU) |