EP0717880 - CURRENT LIMITING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 12.07.2000 [2000/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIER, Reinhard Anna-Hermann-Strasse 54 D-91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
ZIERHUT, Hermann Regentalweg 7 D-93073 Neutraubling / DE | 03 /
MITLEHNER, Heinz Danziger Strasse 1a D-91080 Uttenreuth / DE | [1996/26] | Application number, filing date | 93918960.1 | 08.09.1993 | [1996/26] | WO1993DE00823 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9507548 | Date: | 16.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0717880 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/86 | [1996/26] | CPC: |
H01L29/1608 (EP);
H01L29/861 (EP);
H02H3/025 (EP);
H02H3/087 (EP);
H02H9/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/26] | Title | German: | STROMBEGRENZER | [1996/26] | English: | CURRENT LIMITING DEVICE | [1996/26] | French: | LIMITEUR DE COURANT | [1996/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1996 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1996 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.1996 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.02.1996 | Examination requested [1996/26] | 29.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/28] | 05.03.2000 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2220789 (HANDOTAI KENKYU SHINKOKAI); | [A]FR2410879 (CUTLER HAMMER WORLD TRADE INC [US]) [A] 1,4-6,8 * the whole document * |