EP0749281 - TOOTHBRUSH AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | Opposition rejected | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC Three New Horizons Court, Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC Three New Horizons Court, Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states Jordan A/S Haavard Martinsens Vei 30 N-0978 Oslo 9 / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVERSBY, Knut, Olaf Prestasen 29 N-1300 Sandvika / NO | 02 /
ANDRESEN, Knut Arthur Nordlies vei 5 N-0968 Oslo / NO | 03 /
VESTHEIM, Nils, Terje Bergensvn. 38 N-0963 Oslo / NO | [1999/46] |
Former [1996/52] | 01 /
LEVERSBY, Knut, Olaf Prestosen 29 N-1300 Sandvika / NO | ||
02 /
ANDRESEN, Knut Arthur Nordlies vei 5 N-0968 Oslo / NO | |||
03 /
VESTHEIM, Nils, Terje Bergensvn. 38 N-0963 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Walker, Ralph Francis, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/52] | Walker, Ralph Francis, Dr., et al SmithKline Beecham plc Corporate Intellectual Property, Two New Horizons Court Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9EP / GB | ||
Former [1996/52] | Onn, Thorsten, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Box 23101 104 35 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93919714.1 | 01.09.1993 | [1996/52] | WO1993NO00132 | Priority number, date | DE19924229152 | 01.09.1992 Original published format: DE 4229152 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405183 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749281 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0749281 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/04, B29C45/14 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
B29C45/16 (EP,US);
A46B5/02 (EP,US);
A46B5/026 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
B29L2031/425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI [1996/52] | Title | German: | ZAHNBÜRSTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER ZAHNBÜRSTE | [1996/52] | English: | TOOTHBRUSH AND METHOD FOR MAKING SUCH TOOTHBRUSH | [1996/52] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1996/52] | Entry into regional phase | 03.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 03.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.1995 | Examination requested [1996/52] | 26.02.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.1997 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 19.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2000
26.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | 02
17.08.2000
20.02.2003
WITHDRAWN CORONET-Werke GmbH Neustadt 2 69479 Wald-Michelbach / DE Opponents representative Lichti, Heiner Lichti - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2000
26.09.2000
ADMISSIBLE Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
02
17.08.2000
20.02.2003
WITHDRAWN CORONET-Werke GmbH Neustadt 2 69479 Wald-Michelbach / DE Opponents representative Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Bergwaldstrasse 1 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
Former [2000/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2000
Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
02
17.08.2000
CORONET-Werke GmbH ----- 69479 Wald-Michelbach / DE Opponents representative Lichti, Heiner, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Bergwaldstrasse 1 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | |||
Former [2000/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.08.2000
ADMISSIBLE Braun GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | 10.10.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.04.2001 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.03.2003 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.03.2003 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2003/33] | Request for further processing for: | 02.07.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.07.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3914081 (AOKI KATASHI); | [A]DE9103553U ; | [X]US5052071 (HALM HANS [DE]); | [X]US5054154 (SCHIFFER CARL [DE], et al) |