EP0726821 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A VEHICLE TO A STRAIGHTENING BENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Uno Liner System Aktiebolag Svedengatan 2 582 73 Linköping / SE | [1998/24] |
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states UNO JOHANSSON LINER AB Svedengatan 2 S-582 73 Linköping / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHANSSON, Uno Högdalsgatan 25 S-582 63 Linköping / SE | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Willquist, Bo Lorentz Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Willquist, Bo Albihn Willquist AB S:t Larsgatan 23 582 24 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 93919792.7 | 07.09.1993 | [1996/34] | WO1993SE00729 | Priority number, date | SE19920002590 | 08.09.1992 Original published format: SE 9202590 | [1996/34] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9405440 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726821 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726821 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/12 | [1996/34] | CPC: |
B21D1/145 (EP,US);
Y10S72/705 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/34] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UM EIN AUTO AUF EINER RICHTBANK ZU FIXIEREN | [1996/34] | English: | DEVICE FOR FIXING A VEHICLE TO A STRAIGHTENING BENCH | [1996/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FIXTION D'UN VEHICULE A UN BANC REDRESSEUR | [1996/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.1994 | Translation filed | 17.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 21.02.1995 | Examination requested [1996/34] | 11.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.12.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 05.08.1998 | FR | 05.08.1998 | IT | 05.08.1998 | GB | 05.11.1998 | DE | 06.11.1998 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/35] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
FR | 05.08.1998 | ||
GB | 05.11.1998 | ||
DE | 06.11.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | ES | 05.08.1998 | |
GB | 05.11.1998 | ||
DE | 06.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [2000/03] | GB | 05.11.1998 | |
DE | 06.11.1998 | ||
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/24] | DE | 06.11.1998 | |
FR | 31.12.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 31.12.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A]SE426660 (VENELEINEN TEUVO OLAVI); | [A]WO8911354 (MAEKELAE TOIVO [FI]); | [A]US5035135 (MAEKELAE TOIVO [FI]); | [A]US5040402 (VIERTO RAINE [FI]) |