EP0704051 - CENTRIFUGE LEAK TEST APPARATUS FOR FOOTWEAR AND APPAREL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.1998 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1998 [1998/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark Delaware 19714-9206 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | For all designated states W.L. GORE & ASSOCIATES, INC. 551 Paper Mill Road, P.O. Box 9206 Newark, Delaware 19714-9206 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGAR, Thomas, Gerard 4926 S. Raintree Ct. Wilmington DE 19808-1011 / US | 02 /
YALAMANCHILI, Seshamamba 410 Harmony Street New Castle, DE 19720 / US | [1996/14] | Representative(s) | McCallum, William Potter Marks & Clerk 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/14] | McCallum, William Potter Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920084.6 | 12.08.1993 | [1996/14] | WO1993US07681 | Priority number, date | US19930080024 | 18.06.1993 Original published format: US 80024 | [1996/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9500826 | Date: | 05.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0704051 | Date: | 03.04.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.1995 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0704051 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/04 | [1996/14] | CPC: |
G01M3/02 (EP,US);
G01M3/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1996/14] | Title | German: | ZENTRIFUGALE LECKPRÜFVORRICHTUNG FÜR SCHUHWERK UND KLEIDUNG | [1996/14] | English: | CENTRIFUGE LEAK TEST APPARATUS FOR FOOTWEAR AND APPAREL | [1996/14] | French: | APPAREIL POUR TESTER PAR CENTRIFUGATION L'IMPERMEABILITE D'ARTICLES CHAUSSANTS ET D'HABILLEMENT | [1996/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.05.1995 | Examination requested [1996/14] | 24.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH04204028 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921106), vol. 16, no. 536, Database accession no. (P - 1449), & JP04204028 A 19920724 (TAISEI RAMITSUKU KK ET AL.) [A] 1,9,14 * abstract * |