EP0656839 - THROTTLE TRACTION CONTROL FOR AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1995/24] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGLETON, William, Andrew 15500 Chamberlain Road Grafton, OH 44044 / US | 02 /
BURNS, Robert, Dale 7373 Akins North Royalton, OH 44133 / US | [1995/24] | Representative(s) | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/24] | Allen, William Guy Fairfax, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920222.2 | 19.08.1993 | [1995/24] | WO1993US07824 | Priority number, date | US19920934607 | 25.08.1992 Original published format: US 934607 | [1995/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9404384 | Date: | 03.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0656839 | Date: | 14.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0656839 | Date: | 17.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/16 | [1995/24] | CPC: |
B60K28/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1995/24] | Title | German: | DROSSELKLAPPEN-VORTRIEBSSTEUERUNG FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [1995/24] | English: | THROTTLE TRACTION CONTROL FOR AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE | [1995/24] | French: | ANTIPATINAGE A L'ACCELERATION POUR VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [1995/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 06.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0298232 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7 * page 4, line 46 - page 6, line 20 ** page 9, line 4 - line 37; figures 1-3,6 *; | [YA]DE3924604 (AKEBONO BRAKE IND [JP], et al) [Y] 9,10 * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 22 * * column 2, line 38 - column 4, line 51; figures 1-4 * [A] 1,7; | [AD]US4955448 (ISE KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [AD] 1-8,11,12 * column 6, line 1 - column 10, line 56; figures 4-12 *; | [XY]EP0485779 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,11,12 * page 4, line 3 - page 7, line 54; figures 1-4 * [Y] 9,10; | [XA]EP0486878 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,7 * column 3, line 10 - column 9, line 28; figures 1-2C * [A] 4-6,11,12 |