EP0662921 - CONTAINER CONVERTIBLE FOR USE AS A PLANT PROTECTION COVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAK, John Sr. 547 Glenway Ave Winnipeg Manitoba R2G 1H8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states ZAK, John Sr. 547 Glenway Ave Winnipeg, Manitoba R2G 1H8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1995/29] | Representative(s) | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/29] | Adkins, Michael, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 93920627.2 | 29.09.1993 | [1995/29] | WO1993CA00391 | Priority number, date | CA19922079363 | 29.09.1992 Original published format: CA 2079363 | [1995/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407768 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662921 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662921 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/36, B65D8/06, A01G13/04 | [1995/29] | CPC: |
B65D85/52 (EP,US);
A01G13/04 (EP,US);
B65D11/16 (EP,US);
B65D81/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/29] | Title | German: | UMWANDELBARER BEHÄLTER ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS PFLANZENSCHUTZDECKEL | [1997/23] | English: | CONTAINER CONVERTIBLE FOR USE AS A PLANT PROTECTION COVER | [1995/29] | French: | RECIPIENT CONVERTIBLE EN COUVERTURE PROTECTRICE POUR UNE PLANTE | [1995/29] |
Former [1995/29] | UMWANDELBARER BEHÄLTER ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS PFLANZENSCHUTZGECKEL | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 24.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.06.1997 | FR | 04.06.1997 | NL | 04.06.1997 | DE | 05.09.1997 | GB | 29.09.1997 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
NL | 04.06.1997 | ||
DE | 05.09.1997 | ||
GB | 29.09.1997 | ||
FR | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/41] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
DE | 05.09.1997 | ||
GB | 29.09.1997 | ||
FR | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
DE | 05.09.1997 | ||
FR | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | AT | 04.06.1997 | |
DE | 05.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 04.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2018974 (LAIRD R A, et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US4821453 (MOREHEAD JAMES B [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * column W *; | [A]DE9115282U (OST) [A] 1 * the whole document * |