blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0788692

EP0788692 - METHOD FOR ASSIGNING PRIORITY TO TRAFFIC BETWEEN LOCAL AREA NETWORKS INTERCONNECTED VIA A BACKBONE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nokia Networks Oy
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
[1999/49]
Former [1997/40]For all designated states
NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY
Keilalahdentie 4
02150 Espoo / FI
Former [1997/33]For all designated states
NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY
Mäkkylän Puistotie 1
02600 Espoo / FI
Inventor(s)01 / PYHÄLAMMI, Seppo
Sankaritie 4 A 1
FIN-00320 Helsinki / FI
[1997/33]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1997/33]Tomlinson, Kerry John, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date93920874.001.10.1993
[1997/33]
WO1993FI00393
Priority number, dateFI1992000448205.10.1992         Original published format: FI 924482
[1997/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9408411
Date:14.04.1994
Language:EN
[1994/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0788692
Date:13.08.1997
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1997/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0788692
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE14.04.1994
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/46, H04L12/66
[1997/33]
CPC:
H04L12/4625 (EP,US); H04L12/28 (EP,US); H04L12/46 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [1997/33]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR PRIORITÄTSZUORDNUNG FÜR VERKEHR ZWISCHEN ÜBER EIN HAUPTNETZ VERBUNDENEN LOKALEN NETZEN[1997/33]
English:METHOD FOR ASSIGNING PRIORITY TO TRAFFIC BETWEEN LOCAL AREA NETWORKS INTERCONNECTED VIA A BACKBONE NETWORK[1997/33]
French:PROCEDE D'ASSIGNATION DE PRIORITES AU TRAFIC ENTRE LES RESEAUX LOCAUX INTERCONNECTES PAR UN RESEAU DE BASE[1997/33]
Entry into regional phase21.04.1995National basic fee paid 
21.04.1995Designation fee(s) paid 
21.04.1995Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1994Request for preliminary examination filed
21.04.1995Examination requested  [1997/33]
09.03.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.04.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.06.1999Fee for grant paid
17.06.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.1995Renewal fee patent year 03
28.10.1996Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.1997Renewal fee patent year 05
12.10.1998Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]US5060228  (TSUTSUI EIICHI [JP], et al);
 [A]US5088090  (YACOBY AMNON [IL]);
 [A]US5144622  (TAKIYASU YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al);
 [AP]US5168495  (SMITH T BASIL [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.