EP0652846 - TROLLEY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JAN VAN HUET TRANSPORT B.V. Einsteinstraat 17 6902 PB Zevenaar / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | For all designated states JAN VAN HÜET TRANSPORT B.V. Einsteinstraat 17 NL-6902 PB Zevenaar / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN HUET, Aloisius, Leonardus, Johannes, Maria De Horst 13 NL-7902 BC Zevenaar / NL | [1997/02] |
Former [1995/20] | 01 /
VAN HU T, Aloisius, Leonardus, Johannes, Maria De Horst 13 NL-7902 BC Zevenaar / NL | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1995/20] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 93921121.5 | 30.07.1993 | [1995/20] | WO1993NL00164 | Priority number, date | NL19920001388 | 31.07.1992 Original published format: NL 9201388 | [1995/20] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9403388 | Date: | 17.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0652846 | Date: | 17.05.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0652846 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B66C11/04, B60P1/54 | [1995/20] | CPC: |
B60P1/5442 (EP);
B66C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/20] | Title | German: | LAUFKATZE | [1995/20] | English: | TROLLEY | [1995/20] | French: | CHARIOT PORTE-PALAN | [1995/20] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.1995 | Translation filed | 31.01.1995 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/20] | 22.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]FR1306097 (FAYET) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document * [A] 4; | [Y]DE699408 (GANSTER) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR1441669 (MONNE) [AD] 1,4,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5062760 (SAMANIEGO) [A] 1-4,9 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 29 *; | [A]US4425071 (DUNBAR); | [A]US4194867 (BRAGG); | [A]WO9212025 (JAN VAN HÜET TRANSPORT); | [A]DE2811797 (ADOLFSSON); | [AD]GB2105294 (PRATT) |