Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] |
08.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] |
16.08.1996 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.1996 [1996/40] |
13.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
31.07.1996 | Renewal fee | |
15.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
12.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
26.10.1995 | First examination report | |
20.10.1994 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] |
29.07.1994 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] |