Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3404041B | Global Dossier | 06.05.2003 | B2 | JPH07501507 | 16.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 | US9308122 | 26.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU659985B | Global Dossier | 01.06.1995 | B2 | AU4840593 | 26.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 | US9308122 | 26.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0614424 | Global Dossier | 02.10.1996 | B1 | EP0614424 | 14.09.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 | US9308122 | 26.08.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69305153T | 13.02.1997 | T2 | DE69305153D1 | 07.11.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 | US9308122 | 26.08.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9407706 | Global Dossier | 14.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2117272 | 14.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5323667 | 28.06.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US95564092 | 02.10.1992 |