EP0610495 - TELEVISION TUNING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.04.2001 [2001/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADGER, David, Mark 4615 Stansbury Court Indianapolis, IN 46254 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Postfach 61 04 34 30604 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Thomson Consumer Electronics Sales GmbH Postfach 91 13 45 D-30433 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 93921249.4 | 30.08.1993 | [1994/33] | WO1993US08150 | Priority number, date | GB19920018373 | 28.08.1992 Original published format: GB 9218373 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406208 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610495 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610495 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03J1/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
H03J1/0075 (EP);
H03J1/005 (EP);
H03J3/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/33] | Title | German: | Abstimmschaltung für Fernsehempfänger | [1994/33] | English: | TELEVISION TUNING APPARATUS | [1994/33] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACCORD POUR TELEVISION | [1994/33] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/33] | 08.07.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/14] | Request for further processing for: | 11.02.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4334323 (MOORE FREDERIC J) [X] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]JPS60194818 ; | [A]EP0298625 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 19; figure 1 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860215), vol. 10, no. 39, Database accession no. (E - 381)<2096> , & JP60194818 A 19851003 (ONKYO K.K.) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |