EP0658291 - STATOR AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTING SAME FOR HIGH POWER DENSITY ELECTRIC MOTORS AND GENERATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIQUE MOBILITY 425 Corporate Circle Golden, CO 80401 / US | [1995/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Hao 5352 S. Danube Court Aurora, CO 80015 / US | 02 /
DeBRUZZI, Michael, S. 24050 Genesee Village Rd. Golden, CO 80401 / US | 03 /
RISO, Thomas A. 4845 Pinon Drive, P.O. Box 1278 Elizabeth, CO 80107 / US | [1995/25] | Representative(s) | Butler, Lance Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/35] | Butler, Lance Butler & Company PO Box 117 73 The Glade Fetcham Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 9LQ / GB | ||
Former [1995/25] | Sama, Daniele Sama Patents Via Masera, 10 I-20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 93921267.6 | 01.09.1993 | [1995/25] | WO1993US08200 | Priority number, date | US19920937311 | 01.09.1992 Original published format: US 937311 | [1995/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9406192 | Date: | 17.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0658291 | Date: | 21.06.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0658291 | Date: | 18.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/12, H02K15/12, H02K9/00, H02K1/16, H02K1/18, H02K15/02 | [1996/12] | CPC: |
H02K15/085 (EP,US);
H02K1/12 (KR);
H02K1/16 (EP,US);
H02K1/185 (EP,US);
H02K15/024 (EP,US);
H02K15/12 (KR);
|
Former IPC [1995/25] | H02K1/12, H02K15/12, H02K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/25] | Title | German: | STATOR FÜR MOTOREN UND GENERATOREN HOHER LEISTUNGDICHTE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1995/25] | English: | STATOR AND METHOD OF CONSTRUCTING SAME FOR HIGH POWER DENSITY ELECTRIC MOTORS AND GENERATORS | [1995/25] | French: | STATOR POUR MOTEURS ET GENERATEURS ELECTRIQUES A HAUTE PUISSANCE VOLUMIQUE ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION DUDIT STATOR | [1995/25] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1995 | Search fee paid | 08.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 08.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/25] | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.02.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.11.1998 | ES | 18.11.1998 | GR | 18.11.1998 | NL | 18.11.1998 | SE | 18.11.1998 | DK | 18.02.1999 | PT | 18.02.1999 | [2003/45] |
Former [2003/08] | BE | 18.11.1998 | |
ES | 18.11.1998 | ||
GR | 18.11.1998 | ||
NL | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
PT | 18.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | BE | 18.11.1998 | |
ES | 18.11.1998 | ||
GR | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
PT | 18.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | BE | 18.11.1998 | |
GR | 18.11.1998 | ||
SE | 18.11.1998 | ||
PT | 18.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | BE | 18.11.1998 | |
GR | 18.11.1998 | ||
PT | 18.02.1999 | ||
Former [1999/32] | BE | 18.11.1998 | |
PT | 18.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS5986441 ; | [A]JPS6146139 ; | [Y]US2557249 (ASKE LEONARD E) [Y] 1,2,4,5,20,22,23 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 40; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]FR1087732 (M.R.MILLET) [A] 6,7 * figures 2,3,7 *; | [A]FR2536222 (VILLEGER MARCEL [FR]) [A] 1,20* page 3, line 22 - line 36; figure 2 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840911), vol. 008, no. 198, Database accession no. (E - 265)<1635>, & JP59086441 A 19840518 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [Y] 1,2,4,5,20,22,23 * abstract * [A] 8 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860717), vol. 010, no. 205, Database accession no. (E - 420), & JP61046139 A 19860306 (SHIBAURA ENG WORKS CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US2761984 (LUDWIG ADAM, et al); | [X]US3824682 (THARMAN P); | [XY]US4990809 (ARTUS RICHARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US5121021 (WARD ROBERT W [US]) |