EP0660927 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING NITROGEN CONTENT IN AQUEOUS SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT ANALYTICAL INC. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [1995/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Yoshihiro 926 Bimmerle Place San Jose, CA 95123 / US | [1995/27] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/27] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93921515.8 | 13.09.1993 | [1995/27] | WO1993US08593 | Priority number, date | US19920944495 | 14.09.1992 Original published format: US 944495 | [1995/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407134 | Date: | 31.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0660927 | Date: | 05.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/00, G01N31/12 | [1995/27] | CPC: |
G01N31/12 (EP);
G01N31/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES STICKSTOFFGEHALTES IN WÄSSRIGEN SYSTEMEN | [1995/27] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING NITROGEN CONTENT IN AQUEOUS SYSTEMS | [1995/27] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA TENEUR EN AZOTE DE SYSTEMES AQUEUX | [1995/27] | Entry into regional phase | 13.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 13.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/27] | 25.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/04] | 02.09.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3877875 (R.H.JONES; M.B.JOHNSTON) [Y] 1,6-10 * the whole document * * see particularly column 5, lines 28-34 and lines 50-57;column 6,lines 6-42. * [A] 2-5,11-13; | [YA]JPS61180139 ; | [DA]US4018562 (R.E.PARKS; R.L.MARIETTA) [DA] 1,9,12; | [A]FR2415299 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LTD) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0020072 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2001045 (NV PHILIPS' GLOEILAMPENFABRIEKEN) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0075467 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LTD) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870106), vol. 11, no. 2, Database accession no. (P - 532)<2449> , & JP61180139 A 19860812 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [Y] 1,6-10 * abstract * [A] 2-5,11,12 |