28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
26.12.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
19.04.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
10.11.2000 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2000 [2000/52] |
03.11.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2000 [2000/51] |
27.10.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] |
29.09.2000 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
08.09.2000 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2000 [2000/43] |
15.10.1999 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 01.12.1999 [1999/48] |
23.09.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.05.1999 |
Change - name/address |
published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] |
09.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.04.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.11.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.05.1998 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.12.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.09.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.06.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.02.1997 |
First examination report |
|
22.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.09.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.03.1995 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.04.1995 [1995/17] |
20.01.1995 |
Change - classification |
published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] |
26.08.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] |
26.08.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] |