Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2589967B | Global Dossier | 12.03.1997 | B2 | JPH07503883 | 27.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU660376B | Global Dossier | 22.06.1995 | B2 | AU4929093 | 26.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0618819 | Global Dossier | 01.12.1999 | B1 | EP0618819 | 26.04.1995 | A4 | EP0618819 | 12.10.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69327158T | 06.04.2000 | T2 | DE69327158D1 | 05.01.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0618819T | 10.04.2000 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI941825 | 20.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR970009721B | 17.06.1997 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO940947L | 14.04.1994 | L | NO940947D0 | 16.03.1994 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US9308834 | 17.09.1993 | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9407549 | Global Dossier | 14.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE187085T | 15.12.1999 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2118575 | 17.11.1998 | C | CA2118575 | 31.03.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW229161B | 01.09.1994 | B | Priority number | Date | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5380307 | 10.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US95466992 | 30.09.1992 |